OR HB4083 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-10)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies criteria for erecting roadside memorial signs for deceased veterans formerly prisoners of war or unaccounted for. Takes effects on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to memorial highways; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Veterans. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lewis. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 6--Barreto, Clem, Greenlick, Leif, Smith G, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Prusak, Speaker Kotek. |
2020-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |