OR HB4081 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires supervising physician, or supervising physician organization, to enter into practice agreement with physician assistant in order to use services of physician assistant. Removes requirement that physician assistant practice under supervising physician. Requires physician assistant to enter into collaboration agreement with physician, podiatric physician or qualified physician assistant. Defines "collaboration agreement.] Prohibits Oregon Medical Board from requiring minimum number of hours during which supervising physician must be physically present to provide supervision. Requires that physician assistant have appropriate access to supervising physician. Requires physician assistant who prescribes and dispenses prescription drugs to maintain specified records and follow specified prescription labeling requirements. Becomes operative January 1, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to physician assistants; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-21HouseThird reading. Carried by Mitchell. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 4--Evans, Nearman, Post, Reschke; Excused, 5--Clem, Greenlick, Hayden, Stark, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Holvey, Rayfield, Speaker Kotek.
2020-02-20HouseCarried over to February 21, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-19HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-11HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Health Care.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback