OR HB4081 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to waste plastics; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to waste plastics; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the Co-Speaker. | |
2012-02-09 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. | |
2012-02-07 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Energy, Environment and Water. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |