OR HB4080 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Chapter 31, (2024 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Chapter 31, (2024 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
States a state policy on offshore wind energy. Tells the state agency on energy to make a road map on standards for offshore wind energy. Makes a person involved in an offshore wind energy or port project meet certain labor and supply chain standards. Tells the state agency on land use to assess state policies that may be used in federal reviews of offshore wind leasing decisions. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.0). Declares a state policy to support engagement between offshore wind developers and impacted organizations, communities and tribes. Declares a state policy regarding offshore wind energy development and labor and supply chain standards. Declares a state policy that the interconnection of offshore energy projects be carried out in a manner that promotes electric grid reliability and resilience. Directs the Land Conservation and Development Commission to exercise its rulemaking authority to support these state policies. Directs the State Department of Energy to develop an Offshore Wind Roadmap that defines standards to be considered in the processes related to offshore wind energy development and approval. Requires a developer or contractor involved in an offshore wind energy project, port development project that is necessary for the development of an offshore wind energy project or project related to manufacturing or supply chain that is located on port property and that facilitates the construction, operation or maintenance of an offshore wind energy project to meet certain labor and supply chain standards. Allows a developer or contractor to use a workforce development agreement to comply with the requirements. Directs the Department of Land Conservation and Development to conduct an assessment of the state enforceable policies that may be used in the federal consistency review of offshore wind leasing decisions and related actions. Directs the department to submit a report on the department's activities to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to marine renewable energy and coastal resources not later than September 1, 2025. Modifies certain biennial appropriation made from the General Fund to the Department of Land Conservation and Development. Modifies limitation on expenditures for certain biennial expenses for the Bureau of Labor and Industries. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to offshore wind energy development; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Motion to Refer (Y: 21 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - House Motion to Refer (Y: 21 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - House Motion to Refer (Y: 21 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - House Motion to Refer (Y: 22 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House Motion to Refer (Y: 21 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - House Motion to Refer (Y: 21 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - House Motion to Refer (Y: 21 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-03-05 - House - House Motion to Refer (Y: 22 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-03-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Chapter 31, (2024 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2024. |
2024-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Anderson, Bonham, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Hayden, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Smith DB; Excused, 2--Thatcher, Weber. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed. Ayes, 37; Nays, 21--Boice, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Conrad, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, Lewis, Mannix, McIntire, Osborne, Reschke, Scharf, Stout, Wallan, Wright, Yunker; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Cramer. |
2024-03-05 | House | Motion to refer to Rules failed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 36--Andersen, Boice, Bowman, Bynum, Chaichi, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gamba, Gomberg, Grayber, Hartman, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Levy E, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Neron, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Nosse, Pham H, Pham K, Reynolds, Ruiz, Sanchez, Sosa, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Speaker Rayfield; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Cramer; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Helfrich. |
2024-03-05 | House | Motion to refer to Higher Education failed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 36--Andersen, Boice, Bowman, Bynum, Chaichi, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gamba, Gomberg, Grayber, Hartman, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Levy E, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Neron, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Nosse, Pham H, Pham K, Reynolds, Ruiz, Sanchez, Sosa, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Speaker Rayfield; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Cramer; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Helfrich. |
2024-03-05 | House | Motion to refer to Judiciary failed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 35--Andersen, Boice, Bowman, Chaichi, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gamba, Gomberg, Grayber, Hartman, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Levy E, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Neron, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Nosse, Pham H, Pham K, Reynolds, Ruiz, Sanchez, Sosa, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Speaker Rayfield; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Cramer; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Bynum, Helfrich. |
2024-03-05 | House | Motion to refer to Climate, Energy, and Environment failed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 36--Andersen, Boice, Bowman, Bynum, Chaichi, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gamba, Gomberg, Grayber, Hartman, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Levy E, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Neron, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Nosse, Pham H, Pham K, Reynolds, Ruiz, Sanchez, Sosa, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Speaker Rayfield; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Cramer. |
2024-03-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Grayber. |
2024-03-04 | House | Second reading. |
2024-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2024-03-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-28 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2024-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Business and Labor with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |