OR HB4079 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 56, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Human Services to disregard as resources moneys held in specified pension and retirement accounts in determining eligibility for temporary assistance for needy families.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to retirement accounts for low income individuals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseChapter 56, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
2018-04-03HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-02SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2018-03-02SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by DeBoer. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Kruse, Thatcher.
2018-03-02SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-01SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-03-01HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 7--Barreto, Bonham, Esquivel, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB; Excused, 1--Gorsek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson.
2018-03-01HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-26HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2018-02-26HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Early Childhood and Family Supports with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback