OR HB4078 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that "eligible location," for purposes of certain property tax benefits, includes location not formerly used for industrial purposes. Provides that "eligible property" may be property appraised either by county or by Department of Revenue. Provides that "eligible property" includes property constructed or installed at brownfield that is being cleaned up and cost of initial investment may include remaining cleanup costs. Clarifies definition of "rural area." Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to tax benefits for certain industrial property; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Revenue.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback