OR HB4077 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires statement of economic interest to include certain information about sources of income for business in which public official or candidate, or member of household of public official or candidate, is officer or holds directorship if source of income has legislative or administrative interest and 10 percent or more of total gross annual income of business comes from that source of income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to contents of statements of economic interest.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-20HouseThird Reading. Motion to refer to Rules carried. Referred.
2018-02-19HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Rules.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback