OR HB4074 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-8)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 95, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides proceedings to escheat to State of Oregon matured United States savings bonds presumed abandoned and in custody of state. Authorizes Director of Department of State Lands to seek payment for escheated bonds from United States Treasury. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to escheat of United States savings bonds; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseChapter 95, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
2018-04-10HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Girod. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Boquist, Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-03SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-03-03SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-03SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-03-03HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 3--Boles, Parrish, Post; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer.
2018-03-03HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-03-02HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-28HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2018-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-12HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback