OR HB4073 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 27, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Permits State Mortuary and Cemetery Board to grant temporary operating permit for cemetery without operating license to perform interment. Sunsets January 2, 2020.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to cemeteries; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseChapter 27, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018.
2018-03-16HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-03SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-27SenateThird reading. Carried by Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Boquist, Kruse.
2018-02-26SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2018-02-22SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-20SenateReferred to General Government and Accountability.
2018-02-20SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-19HouseThird reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, McKeown, Stark.
2018-02-16HouseRules suspended. Carried over to February 19, 2018 Calendar.
2018-02-15HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Rules.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback