OR HB4069 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that fixed percentage of certain forecasted video lottery revenues be transferred to counties for economic development. Provides that disbursals to counties from video lottery revenues be adjusted to compensate for differentials between previous biennium's forecasted revenues and actual revenues. Provides that amount transferred to counties from video lottery revenue must be calculated as if certain transfers of lottery revenues to Public Employees Retirement Fund were not made. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to lottery revenues; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback