OR HB4069 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Task Force on Career and Technical Education Teaching for purpose of increasing availability and quality of teachers of career and technical education courses. Sunsets task force on date of convening of 2015 regular session of Legislative Assembly. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to task force on career and technical education; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2014-02-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-07 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |