OR HB4068 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to amend state building code to require that new construction of certain buildings include provisions for electrical service capacity for specified percentage of parking spaces. Requires Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to amend state building code to create electric vehicle charging infrastructure requirements for] require that new construction of certain buildings include provisions for electrical service capacity for specified percentage of parking spaces. Allows municipality to adopt local electric vehicle charging infrastructure requirements exceeding] percentage of parking space requirements higher than state building code requirements. Establishes goal of having 25 percent of vehicles owned or leased by state be zero-emission vehicles.] Requires director to make code amendments effective July 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to vehicles.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-27SenateMinority Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng Minority)
2020-02-27SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng bill.
2020-02-21SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-20SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2020-02-20SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-02-20HouseThird reading. Carried by Wilde. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 20--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Bynum, Drazan, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Zika; Excused, 1--Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Clem, Smith G, Speaker Kotek, Wilson.
2020-02-19HouseCarried over to February 20, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-18HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-17HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-11HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Energy and Environment.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/HB4068
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4068/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4068/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4068/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4068/Senate%20Minority%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4068/Minority%20Report%20to%20B-Engrossed
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30610
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=487739
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2020R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30693

Bill Comments

feedback