OR HB4068 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 26, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes requirements for seed production contracts and seed purchase contracts for seed other than agricultural seed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to seed contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseChapter 26, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
2018-03-16HouseGovernor signed.
2018-02-26SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-26HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-22SenateThird reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-02-21SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-21SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-19SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Business and Transportation.
2018-02-14SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-13HouseThird reading. Carried by Post. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Kennemer.
2018-02-12HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-09HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-08HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback