OR HB4068 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 62, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 62, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirements for concealed handgun license applicants. Provides that either single conviction or single completed drug diversion program for marijuana possession does not disqualify applicant if offense was violation or misdemeanor. Defines "drug diversion program" for purposes of statute.
Title
Relating to concealed handgun license applicants previously charged with marijuana offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] | Rep. Jeff Barker [D] |
Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Rep. Wayne Krieger [R] | Rep. Jim Weidner [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 62, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015. |
2014-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Smith. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Hicks, Tomei; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer. |
2014-02-14 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |