OR HB4058 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 8, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 12, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 8, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 12, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definition of "property services contractor" for purposes of employment law. Removes requirement that nonprofit corporation meet certain requirements for at least five years before filing application for issuance of labor contractor license.] Exempts property services contractors from requirement to submit payroll records to Commissioner of the Bureau of Labor and Industries.] Allows Commissioner of the Bureau of Labor and Industries to issue license to business entity or private nonprofit corporation provided that certain requirements are met. Exempts labor contractor subject to employee indorsement who is employee of property services contractor from providing personal information to Bureau of Labor and Industries. Clarifies requirements for satisfactory proof of insurance for property services contractors. Permits bureau to establish process for administering examination for property services contractor license online. Specifies time frame in which property services contractor shall provide training to certain employees. Requires property services contractor to provide time and pay records to commissioner or employee of property services contractor within 45 days of request for records. Permits person to bring civil action against property services contractor on or after July 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to requirements for labor contractors; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Chapter 8, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 12, 2018. |
2018-03-12 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Linthicum, Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Boquist, Kruse. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Salinas, Reschke. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--McKeown, Stark. |
2018-02-16 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |