OR HB4058 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 61, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 61, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends 40-40-20 education goals to include apprenticeship programs registered with State Apprenticeship and Training Council.
Title
Relating to apprenticeship programs in Oregon's education mission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 61, (2014 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2015. |
2014-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Clem, Hicks, Lininger, Lively. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek, Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley. |
2014-02-04 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Workforce Development. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |