OR HB4056 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 23, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 23, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Distributes civil forfeiture proceeds to scholarship program for children of deceased or disabled public safety officers. Distributes civil forfeiture proceeds to scholarship program for family members] children of deceased or disabled public safety officers. Modifies criteria for scholarship program. Applies to applications for scholarships submitted on or after July 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to civil forfeiture proceeds; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Chapter 23, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018. |
2018-03-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Piluso, Rayfield, Smith G, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Smith Warner. |
2018-02-20 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |