OR HB4055 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 59, (2014 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 59, (2014 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures for collecting emergency communications tax on prepaid wireless telecommunications service and interconnected Voice over Internet Protocol service. For purposes of tax on customer access to 9-1-1 emergency reporting system from prepaid telecommunications service customers, requires Department of Revenue to establish by rule policies and procedures for collection of tax imposed on prepaid services and on fixed interconnected Voice over Internet Protocol service. Directs department to report quarterly on administration of tax imposed on fixed interconnected Voice over Internet Protocol service to legislative committee on revenue. Declares legislative findings concerning scope of existing tax, retroactivity of provisions and intent of Act to facilitate administration of collection of tax. Directs Department of Revenue to report on collections and effectiveness of emergency communications tax to legislative committee on revenue. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the 9-1-1 emergency reporting system; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 59, (2014 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2014. |
2014-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-21 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Berger. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Hicks; Absent, 1--Unger; Excused, 2--Davis, Esquivel. |
2014-02-21 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |