OR HB4054 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 21, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Department of Transportation to enter into intergovernmental agreement with city having population of 500,000 or more for purpose of removing certain personal property from locations owned by department. Authorizes Department of Transportation to enter into intergovernmental agreement with city having population of 500,000 or more for purpose of removing certain personal property from locations within city's urban growth boundary] owned by department. Sunsets January 2, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to removal of personal property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseChapter 21, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
2018-03-16HouseGovernor signed.
2018-02-28SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-26SenateThird reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Kruse.
2018-02-23SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-23SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2018-02-21SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-20SenateReferred to Business and Transportation.
2018-02-20SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-19HouseThird reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--McKeown, Stark.
2018-02-16HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-14HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Transportation Policy.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback