OR HB4054 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes ballot title for Senate Bill 833 (2013) for use in November 2014 general election. Expands list of prior violations that prohibit individual from becoming circulator. Amends time period for which circulator's criminal records check is valid. Permits name of candidate nominated for more than one district office to appear on ballot more than once. Permits elector who submitted ballot in unsigned return identification envelope to remain on active voter registration rolls. Resolves discrepancy regarding day on which challenged ballot records may be released to public. Resolves certification date discrepancy for write-in ballots. Limits prohibition on electioneering to business hours. Permits person to show person's own marked ballot to another person. Precludes judicial review of ballot title. Voids prior ballot title for Senate Bill 833 drafted by Attorney General. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to elections; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-27 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Barton, Lininger. |
2014-02-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Vega Pederson. Passed.Ayes, 36; Nays, 24--Barton, Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett. |
2014-02-26 | House | Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on February 27, 2014 Calendar. |
2014-02-25 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |