OR HB4053 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 113, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Chief Education Office to prepare annual report on accelerated college credit programs. Sunsets report requirements on January 2, 2029. Directs Higher Education Coordinating Commission to develop statewide standards related to information provided by public post-secondary institutions of higher education about accelerated college credit programs. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to accelerated college credit programs; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseChapter 113, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 13, 2018.
2018-04-13HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-13SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-02SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-02SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-01SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2018-03-01HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2018-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-27HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2018-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-23HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Education.
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4053
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4053/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4053/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4053/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4053/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4053/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4053/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27225
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27362
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433284
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433596

Bill Comments

feedback