OR HB4052 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 20, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Small Business Rules Advisory Committee to serve as advisory committee for agencies adopting new administrative rules and to review effectiveness of existing administrative rules. Requires agency to review effect of rule every five years.] Directs Secretary of State to compile reports on rules and to report annually to Legislative Assembly. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to administrative rules; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseChapter 20, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
2018-03-16HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-03SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-27SenateBaertschiger Jr declared potential conflict of interest.
2018-02-27SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Boquist, Kruse.
2018-02-26SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2018-02-22SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-16SenateReferred to General Government and Accountability.
2018-02-16SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-15HouseThird reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Lively; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Olson.
2018-02-14HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-13HouseSubsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2018-02-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2018-02-12HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Economic Development and Trade with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback