OR HB4050 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - Chapter 17, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 5, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - Chapter 17, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 5, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the ocean troll salmon fishery; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the ocean troll salmon fishery; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Atkinson [R] | Rep. Vic Gilliam [R] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Rep. Robert Jenson [R] |
Rep. Wayne Krieger [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Sen. Joanne Verger [D] | Rep. Matthew Wand [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Chapter 17, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 5, 2012. | |
2012-03-05 | Governor signed. | |
2012-02-27 | President signed. | |
2012-02-27 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-23 | Third reading. Carried by Verger. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-22 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-22 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-21 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. | |
2012-02-15 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-14 | Third reading. Carried by Krieger. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Cowan; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Gilliam, Richardson. | |
2012-02-13 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-13 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-09 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Energy, Environment and Water. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |