OR HB4049 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 55, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of State Police to establish multidisciplinary committee on tracking of sexual assault forensic evidence kits. Directs department to adopt recommendations of committee and to create and maintain statewide electronic sexual assault forensic evidence kit tracking system. Establishes requirements of tracking system. Exempts records and information within tracking system from disclosure as public record. Directs department to, no later than January 1, 2019, report on status of tracking system to Task Force on the Testing of Sexual Assault Forensic Evidence Kits and to Governor and Attorney General. Extends sunset of Task Force on the Testing of Sexual Assault Forensic Evidence Kits to June 30, 2021. Directs task force to monitor implementation of tracking system and to, no later than December 1, 2020, submit to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary final report that includes status update on tracking system. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to sexual assault forensic evidence kits; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseChapter 55, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
2018-04-03HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-13SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-02SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-02SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-01SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2018-03-01HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2018-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-26HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2018-02-26HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4049
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4049/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4049/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4049/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4049/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4049/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4049/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27210
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27361
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433274
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433595

Bill Comments

feedback