OR HB4048 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 92, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires principal real estate brokers to complete real estate continuing education courses before renewal or reactivation of license. Requires real estate brokers and real estate property managers to complete real estate continuing education courses before reactivation of license. Prohibits Housing and Community Services Department from requiring elderly housing project that has repaid financing received through department program, and retired bond obligations related to project, to hire licensed real estate property manager, real estate broker or principal real estate broker to perform property management duties with respect to project. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to real estate licensees; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseChapter 92, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
2018-04-10HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-13SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hayden.
2018-03-01SenateDeBoer declared potential conflict of interest.
2018-03-01SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-01SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-28SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2018-02-26SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-19SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-12SenateReferred to Business and Transportation.
2018-02-09SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-08HouseThird reading. Carried by Esquivel. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Nearman.
2018-02-07HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-06HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-05HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4048
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4048/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4048/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4048/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4048/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4048/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4048/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27010
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=430361
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27312
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433304
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433825

Bill Comments

feedback