OR HB4046 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 54, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that outside compensation of employee of Oregon Health and Science University, public university or community college is not included in employee's salary for purposes of Public Employees Retirement System. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to salary under the Public Employees Retirement System; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseChapter 54, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
2018-04-03HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-13SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-02SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-02SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2018-02-27SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-21SenateReferred to Workforce.
2018-02-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-20HouseThird reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 1--Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Gomberg, Meek, Nearman, Noble, Nosse, Reardon, Speaker Kotek.
2018-02-19HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-14HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback