OR HB4046 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 54, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 54, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that outside compensation of employee of Oregon Health and Science University, public university or community college is not included in employee's salary for purposes of Public Employees Retirement System. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to salary under the Public Employees Retirement System; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Chapter 54, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018. |
2018-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 1--Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Gomberg, Meek, Nearman, Noble, Nosse, Reardon, Speaker Kotek. |
2018-02-19 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |