OR HB4045 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 30, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 17, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Chapter 30, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 17, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services to distribute moneys to nonprofit organization to provide grants to organizations for community violence prevention and intervention measures. Directs Oregon Department of Administrative Services to distribute moneys to nonprofit organization to provide grants to organizations for community violence prevention and intervention measures. Requires nonprofit organization to report annually to department. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department for distribution to nonprofit organization. Directs Oregon Health Authority to establish grant programs] program related to community violence prevention. Appropriates moneys from General Fund for grant programs] program. Directs authority to approve national] training and certification program] programs for certified violence prevention professionals and to seek federal approval to secure federal financial participation in costs of providing medical assistance program coverage for community violence prevention services for medical assistance program enrollees who meet certain criteria. Directs authority to establish technical advisory group relating to certified violence prevention professionals. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to public health approaches to community violence prevention; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | House | Chapter 30, (2022 Laws): Effective date March 17, 2022. |
2022-03-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 1--Linthicum; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Girod, Robinson. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reynolds. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Cate; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Holvey, Smith G. |
2022-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2022 Calendar. |
2022-02-24 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-21 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-17 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |