OR HB4037 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-4)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Task Force on Public Assistance Reform to study steps taken in Maine and Kansas to reduce public assistance expenditures. Directs task force to report findings, including recommendations for legislative changes, to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to human services by September 15, 2019. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public assistance; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Early Childhood and Family Supports with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback