OR HB4036 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 16, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 16, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies description of types of interscholastic activities in which homeschooled students and students who attend public charter schools must be allowed to participate if students are in any grade from kindergarten through grade eight. Requires school districts to allow homeschooled students and students who attend public charter schools to participate in interscholastic activities, regardless of whether activities are governed by voluntary association that administers interscholastic activities.] Requires school district to allow students who attend public charter school to participate in interscholastic activities in same manner that residents of school district are allowed to participate. Clarifies requirements for charging fee for public charter school students participating in interscholastic activities. Takes effect July 1, 2018.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to participation in interscholastic activities; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Chapter 16, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2018. |
2018-03-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Linthicum, Roblan. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 8--Dembrow, Frederick, Hass, Manning Jr, Monroe, Riley, Steiner Hayward, Wagner; Excused, 1--Kruse. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-15 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Sollman. |
2018-02-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLane. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 8--Barnhart, Fahey, Greenlick, Holvey, Marsh, Parrish, Sanchez, Sollman; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Lively. |
2018-02-14 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2018-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Education. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |