OR HB4035 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 53, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to provide grants to qualified members of Oregon National Guard to attend community colleges or public universities. Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to provide tuition assistance for] grants to qualified members of Oregon National Guard to attend community colleges or public universities. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to tuition assistance for members of the Oregon National Guard; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseChapter 53, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
2018-04-03HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-13SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-03SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2018-03-03SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-03SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-03-03HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by McLane. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Kennemer.
2018-03-03HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2018-03-02HouseWork Session held.
2018-03-01HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2018-03-01HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2018-02-15HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-15HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4035
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4035/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4035/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4035/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4035/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4035/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4035/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27141
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27405
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433767
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433947

Bill Comments

feedback