OR HB4031 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Health Authority to assess supply and demand of behavioral health professionals in state, report findings of assessment to legislature and make recommendations for legislation not later than November 1, 2020. Removes exemption from requirement to obtain licensure for persons providing certain counseling services.] Directs Oregon Health Authority to assess supply and demand of behavioral health professionals in state, report findings of assessment to legislature and make recommendations for legislation not later than November 1, 2020. Expresses policy of state to respect worth and dignity of persons with addictive disorders and to avoid stereotypes in state correspondence and publications. Amends existing law to replace stereotypes, such as "drug addict," with person-first terms, such as "person with a substance use disorder." Describes "person-first.] Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to behavioral health; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2020-02-10HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2020-02-06HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Behavioral Health.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback