OR HB4030 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies and delays implementation of requirements for pharmacy benefit managers. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to pharmacy benefit managers; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 6--Barreto, Clem, Greenlick, Leif, Smith G, Wallan. |
2020-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |