OR HB4026 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Chapter 10, (2024 Laws): Effective date March 20, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

The Act states how certain UGB changes are to be reviewed. (Flesch Readability Score: 87.9). [Digest: Tells the Secretary of State to study voting. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.2).] [Requires the Secretary of State to study how to improve voter access in this state. Directs the secretary to submit the findings to the interim committees of the Legislative Assembly related to elections not later than September 15, 2025.] Limits the review of certain local government proposals to modify the local government's urban growth boundary to the process outlined in statute. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to elections; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-25HouseChapter 10, (2024 Laws): Effective date March 20, 2024.
2024-03-20HouseGovernor signed.
2024-03-19SenatePresident signed.
2024-03-13HouseSpeaker signed.
2024-03-07SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Sollman.
2024-03-07SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Bonham, Boquist, Robinson; Excused, 2--Thatcher, Weber.
2024-03-07SenateSecond reading.
2024-03-07SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2024-03-06SenateWork Session held.
2024-03-05SenatePublic Hearing held.
2024-03-04SenateReferred to Rules.
2024-03-01SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2024-02-29HouseVote explanation(s) filed by McLain.
2024-02-29HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Breese-Iverson. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 5--Chaichi, Grayber, McLain, Sosa, Stout; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Cramer, Owens, Scharf; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Elmer, Goodwin.
2024-02-29HouseSecond reading.
2024-02-28HouseSubsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2024-02-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2024-02-27HouseWork Session held.
2024-02-20HousePublic Hearing held.
2024-02-05HouseReferred to Rules with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2024-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Measures/Overview/HB4026
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4026/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4026/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4026/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4026/Enrolled
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25999
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/26075
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81159
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/282132
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/282238
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/282707
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/82301
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/82304
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/82326
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/283081
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/283082
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/82411
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/283516
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/283517
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/283518
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/283614
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/283631
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/283632
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/283633
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/82679
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36940
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=609833
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/37074
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=611233

Bill Comments

feedback