OR HB4025 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Legislative Policy and Research Director to study methods for supporting economic resilience in communities affected by emergencies or disasters. Requires director to submit report to Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to emergency preparedness; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Economic Development and Trade with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |