OR HB4022 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs district school board to ensure that curriculum of each course of study offered by school district is made available to public on school district's website. Directs district school board to ensure that curriculum of each course of study offered by school district is made available to public on school district's website. Phases in requirement for small school districts. Takes effect July 1, 2022.
Title
Relating to the provision of information for courses of study offered by school districts; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 26 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-22 | House | Motion to withdraw from Education failed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 32--Alonso Leon, Bynum, Campos, Dexter, Fahey, Helm, Holvey, Hoy, Hudson, Kropf, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Meek, Nelson, Neron, Nosse, Pham, Power, Prusak, Reardon, Reynolds, Ruiz, Salinas, Sanchez, Schouten, Smith Warner, Sosa, Speaker Rayfield, Valderrama, Williams, Witt; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Grayber, Nathanson. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Education. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |