OR HB4022 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 90, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Permits state agency to locate devices or facilities for providing electricity to public for electric motor vehicles in locations sufficient to meet demand for devices or facilities. Requires Oregon Department of Administrative Services to establish criteria for determining appropriate number of locations for devices and facilities. Provides that state agency shall set price for electricity that recovers, to extent practicable, costs of operating or administering devices or facilities and that does not exceed 110 percent of market price in county for delivering electricity to public for electric motor vehicles. Requires state agency to set uniform price for electricity in accordance with criteria and calculation that department specifies. Requires Oregon Department of Administrative Services to report to Legislative Assembly not later than February 1, 2019, February 1, 2021, and February 1, 2023, concerning state agency implementation of authority granted in Act. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to electricity for motor vehicles; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 53 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseChapter 90, (2018 Laws): Effective date June 2, 2018.
2018-04-10HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-13SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 53; Nays, 6--Kennemer, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Sprenger; Excused, 1--Hayden.
2018-03-01SenateThatcher declared potential conflict of interest.
2018-03-01SenateThird reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 7--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Linthicum, Olsen; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-02-28SenateTaken from 02-28 Calendar and placed on 03-01 Calendar on voice vote.
2018-02-27SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2018-02-22SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-16SenateReferred to General Government and Accountability.
2018-02-16SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-15HouseThird reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 5--Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Wilson; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Lively.
2018-02-14HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-12HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Energy and Environment.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4022
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4022/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4022/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4022/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4022/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27121
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=431585
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27280
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433187
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433824

Bill Comments

feedback