OR HB4019 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Chapter 8, (2024 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

The Act sets the date, time and processes for the meeting of electors of the President and Vice President of the United States. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.7). Provides for the date and time of the convening of electors of the President and Vice President of the United States. Requires the Secretary of State to preside over the convening of electors and to act on behalf of the electors for any duties placed on the electors under federal or state law. Requires the Governor and the Secretary of State to issue a certificate of ascertainment of appointment of electors in accordance with federal law. Establishes the time, date and process for filling any vacancy in the office of elector. Takes effect on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to presidential electors; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-25HouseChapter 8, (2024 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2024.
2024-03-20HouseGovernor signed.
2024-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2024-03-05HouseSpeaker signed.
2024-03-04SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 3--Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson.
2024-03-01SenateCarried over to 03-04 by unanimous consent.
2024-02-29SenateSecond reading.
2024-02-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2024-02-27SenateWork Session held.
2024-02-22SenatePublic Hearing held.
2024-02-19SenateReferred to Rules.
2024-02-19SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2024-02-15HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Javadi; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Stout, Speaker Rayfield.
2024-02-15HouseSecond reading.
2024-02-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2024-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2024-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2024-02-05HouseReferred to Rules.
2024-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Measures/Overview/HB4019
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4019/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4019/Enrolled
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81152
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/280086
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/280673
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81486
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/280759
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81515
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/280940
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/81691
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/282267
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/282270
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/282271
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/282593
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/282614
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/282615
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/282616
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/82374
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36767
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=608366
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/36944
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2024R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=610192

Bill Comments

feedback