OR HB4017 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires school district to obtain approval from Department of Education before entering into funds diversion agreement for payment of debt service on pension obligation bonds. Provides that department may not approve funds diversion agreement unless annual debt service on pension obligation bonds of school district is no greater than 25 percent of state school moneys available to school district in current fiscal year, or if state school moneys available to school district constitute less than 25 percent of funding for school district in current fiscal year. Requires State Treasurer to provide relevant data to department. Becomes operative July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to bonds.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Revenue.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback