OR HB4011 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 54, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-18 - Chapter 54, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 13, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits pawnbroker to charge pledgor $1 fee to renew placement of firearm with pawnbroker. Provides that city or county may not require precious metal secondhand dealer that is also pawnbroker to provide photograph of item of precious metal acquired in transaction. Changes required delivery method for notice that pledgor is at risk of forfeiting pledge that secures loan of $1,500 or more from certified mail to regular mail. Requires pawnbroker to bear postal expenses for mailing notice. Specifies that pledgor's grace period in which to redeem pledge or renew loan is 30 days after loan period expires or 30 days after mailing date of notice, whichever date is later. Becomes operative July 1, 2014. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to pawnbrokers; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | Chapter 54, (2014 Laws): Effective date March 13, 2014. |
2014-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Barker; Excused, 1--Smith. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 2--Hoyle, Nathanson; Excused, 3--Fagan, Hanna, Richardson. |
2014-02-13 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2014-02-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2014-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2014-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |