OR HB4009 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies administrative provisions of corporate activity tax. Exempts from taxation certain sales of milk and manufactured dwelling park nonprofit cooperatives. Allows unitary group taxpayer to exclude members lacking ties to state. Defines cost inputs for taxpayer engaged in farming operation, for purpose of calculation of subtraction. Establishes methods for taxpayer engaged in farming operation to demonstrate percentage of goods sold in state compared to outside state for purposes of determining commercial activity. Specifies that taxpayer is required to register one time only. Provides that returns and allowances are allowed as offset against commercial activity in year commercial activity is received.] returns or allowances are made. Provides for commercial activity ratio for] Prescribes methods for apportionment of subtraction. Establishes penalties for failure to file annual return or failure to pay tax by due date of annual return. Requires minimum payment per quarter but bars payment if taxpayer makes payment equal to required installment for corresponding quarter of prior year. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to corporate activity tax; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-03-05HouseCarried over to March 8, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-03-04HouseCarried over to March 5, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-03-03HouseCarried over to March 4, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-03-02HouseCarried over to March 3, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-28HouseCarried over to March 2, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-27HouseCarried over to February 28, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-26HouseCarried over to February 27, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-25HouseCarried over to February 26, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2020-02-24HouseSecond reading.
2020-02-24HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2020-02-20HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-19HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-11HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-10HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Revenue.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback