OR HB4008 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 11, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes calculation of projected future earning potential of plaintiff that takes into account race or ethnicity of plaintiff inadmissible in civil action. Prohibits fact finder from determining plaintiff's damages for civil cause of action using calculation for projected future earning potential of plaintiff that takes into account race or ethnicity of plaintiff.] Directs court to instruct jury in civil action involving claim for projected future earnings that jury may not consider race or ethnicity of plaintiff.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to damages for civil causes of action that take into account race or ethnicity of plaintiff.

Sponsors

Rep. Karin Power [D]Rep. Duane Stark [R]Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D]Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D]
Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D]Rep. Jeff Barker [D]Rep. Philip Barnhart [D]Rep. Gregory Barreto [R]
Rep. Denyc Boles [R]Rep. Daniel Bonham [R]Rep. Deborah Boone [D]Rep. Knute Buehler [R]
Rep. Janelle Bynum [D]Rep. Brian Clem [D]Rep. Margaret Doherty [D]Rep. Sal Esquivel [R]
Rep. Paul Evans [D]Rep. Julianne Fahey [D]Rep. Lynn Findley [R]Rep. David Gomberg [D]
Rep. Chris Gorsek [D]Rep. Mitch Greenlick [D]Rep. Cedric Hayden [R]Sen. Dallas Heard [R]
Rep. Jeff Helfrich [R]Rep. Ken Helm [D]Rep. Diego Hernandez [D]Rep. Paul Holvey [D]
Rep. Bill Kennemer [R]Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D]Rep. Tina Kotek [D]Rep. Rick Lewis [R]
Rep. John Lively [D]Rep. Sheri Malstrom [D]Rep. Pam Marsh [D]Rep. Caddy McKeown [D]
Rep. Susan McLain [D]Rep. Mike McLane [R]Rep. Mark Meek [D]Rep. Nancy Nathanson [D]
Rep. Mike Nearman [R]Rep. Ronald Noble [R]Rep. Robert Nosse [D]Rep. Andy Olson [R]
Rep. Julie Parrish [R]Rep. Carla Piluso [D]Rep. Bill Post [R]Rep. Dan Rayfield [D]
Rep. Jeff Reardon [D]Rep. Eric Reschke [R]Rep. Andrea Salinas [D]Rep. David Smith [R]
Rep. Gregory Smith [R]Rep. Barbara Warner [D]Rep. Janeen Sollman [D]Rep. Sherrie Sprenger [R]
Rep. Armand Vial [R]Rep. Gene Whisnant [R]Rep. Jennifer Williamson [D]Rep. Carl Wilson [R]
Rep. Bradley Witt [D]Sen. Herman Baertschiger [R]Sen. Cliff Bentz [R]Sen. Leslee Beyer [D]
Sen. Brian Boquist [R]Sen. Ginny Burdick [D]Sen. Peter Courtney [D]Sen. Alan DeBoer [R]
Sen. Michael Dembrow [D]Sen. Lew Frederick [D]Sen. Sara Gelser [D]Sen. Fred Girod [R]
Sen. Bill Hansell [R]Sen. Mark Hass [D]Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D]Sen. Tim Knopp [R]
Sen. Jeff Kruse [R]Sen. Dennis Linthicum [R]Sen. James Manning [D]Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D]
Sen. Rod Monroe [D]Sen. Alan Olsen [R]Sen. Charles Riley [D]Sen. Arnie Roblan [D]
Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D]Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D]Sen. Lona Thatcher [R]Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R]
Sen. Rob Wagner [D]Sen. Jackie Winters [R]

Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseChapter 11, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
2018-03-16HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-05SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-03HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-01SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-01SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2018-02-27SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-23SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2018-02-16SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-15HouseThird reading. Carried by Stark, Power. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Lively.
2018-02-14HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-12HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback