OR HB4006 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 47, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Housing and Community Services Department to annually provide to each city with population greater than 10,000 data showing percentage of renter households in city that are severely rent burdened. Requires city in which at least 25 percent of renter households are severely rent burdened to complete survey related to affordability of housing within city and to hold public meeting to discuss issue. Requires each city with population greater than 10,000 to submit annual report to Department of Land Conservation and Development setting forth total number, within certain categories, of residential units permitted and produced in preceding calendar year. Appropriates moneys to Department of Land Conservation and Development for purpose of providing technical assistance to local governments in increasing affordability of housing, with priority to cities in which at least 25 percent of renter households are severely rent burdened. Appropriates moneys to Housing and Community Services Department for purpose of studying cost of affordable housing and providing technical assistance grants to promote development of subsidized affordable housing. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to housing; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11HouseChapter 47, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 3, 2018.
2018-04-03HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-13SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-02SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-02SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-01SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-03-01HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Keny-Guyer. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2018-03-01HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2018-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-22HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2018-02-22HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-19HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2018-02-14HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2018-02-14HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2018-02-13HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4006
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4006/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4006/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4006/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4006/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4006/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4006/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27126
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27358
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433270
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433591

Bill Comments

feedback