OR HB4006 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Chapter 40, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Chapter 40, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to wildlife; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to wildlife; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Chapter 40, (2012 Laws): Effective date March 16, 2012. | |
2012-03-16 | Governor signed. | |
2012-02-29 | President signed. | |
2012-02-29 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Dingfelder, Winters. | |
2012-02-25 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-25 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2012-02-24 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-24 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill, refer to Rules. Refer to Rules by order of the President. | |
2012-02-23 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-21 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-13 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. | |
2012-02-13 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2012-02-10 | Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Nolan; Excused, 3--Garrett, Lindsay, Richardson. | |
2012-02-09 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-08 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2012-02-07 | Work Session held. | |
2012-02-02 | Public Hearing held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. | |
2012-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |