OR HB4005 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 7, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 12, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires prescription drug manufacturer to report annually information to Department of Consumer and Business Services regarding prices of prescription drugs and costs associated with developing and marketing prescription drugs. Authorizes department to impose civil penalties on manufacturer for failing to comply with reporting requirements. Requires health insurers that offer prescription drug benefit to report to department specified information about prescription drug prices and impact of prescription drug prices on premium rates. Authorizes department to adopt by rule fees on manufacturers. Requires department to conduct annual public hearing on prescription drug prices and related information reported by manufacturers. Establishes Task Force on the Fair Pricing of Prescription Drugs. Specifies membership and duties. Requires task force to submit report to Legislative Assembly by November 1, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the price of prescription drugs; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseChapter 7, (2018 Laws): Effective date March 12, 2018.
2018-03-12HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-12SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-02SenateLinthicum declared potential conflict of interest.
2018-03-02SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward, Linthicum. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Girod, Hansell; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-02SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-01SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-28HouseThird reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 14--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Esquivel, Findley, Hayden, Heard, Kennemer, Nearman, Reschke, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson.
2018-02-27HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2018-02-23HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-20HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2018-02-20HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-16HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2018-02-13HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-09HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4005
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4005/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4005/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4005/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4005/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4005/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4005/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27102
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27287
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=432976
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433588

Bill Comments

feedback