OR HB4004 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands membership of Public Defense Services Commission from seven to nine members. Modifies qualifications of members. Modifies duties of commission. Directs commission to adopt specified policies, including policies concerning compensation, caseloads and oversight. Directs commission to report on implementation of changes to committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary on or before March 1, 2021. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Public Defense Services Commission; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session scheduled. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-02-11 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 1--Wallan. |
2020-02-10 | House | Second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |