OR HB4004 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Environmental Quality Commission to adopt rules applying certain oil spill prevention and emergency response planning requirements to railroads that own or operate high hazard train routes in this state. Modifies certain requirements under oil or hazardous material spillage statutes. Requires railroads that own or operate high hazard train routes to submit annually certain proof of financial responsibility for high hazard train routes. Establishes High Hazard Train Route Oil Spill Prevention Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to Department of Environmental Quality to be used for costs related to contingency planning and preparedness for high hazard train routes. Becomes operative January 1, 2019. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to safe transportation of hazardous substances; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4004 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4004/Introduced |