OR HB4003 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-5)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Housing and Community Services Department to provide grants, loans and technical assistance to organizations increasing homeownership program access to persons of color. Defines "persons of color." Authorizes expending Home Ownership Assistance Account funds for those purposes. Makes Oregon Housing Fund and subaccounts available to federally recognized Indian tribes that hold land in this state. Allows Department of Consumer and Business Services to require implicit bias training for mortgage loan originators. Requires Real Estate Commissioner to add implicit bias component to real estate licensing exam and continuing education credits by January 1, 2022. Requires Appraiser Certification and Licensure Board to add implicit bias component to education requirements for appraiser certification or licensure by January 1, 2022. Requires real estate licensee acting as buyer's agent to provide information to buyer regarding low-income home buyer opportunities. Establishes Joint Task Force on Addressing Racial Disparities in Home Ownership. Requires task force to report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before December 1, 2020. Sunsets task force on February 1, 2021. Appropriates moneys to Housing and Community Services Department and Legislative Policy and Research Committee] to administer Act. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to addressing disparities; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-03-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2020-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-26HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2020-02-26HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-21HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2020-02-17HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-17HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2020-02-12HouseWork Session held.
2020-02-05HousePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2020-02-03HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-01-27HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback