OR HB4003 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain public improvement contracts to meet certain requirements related to use of diesel engines in course of performing public improvement contract. Requires Environmental Quality Commission to adopt indirect source review program by rule. Requires certain nonroad diesel engines to be registered with Department of Environmental Quality. Authorizes commission to adopt rules and registration fees. Directs commission to adopt by rule diesel engine emission standards for medium-duty trucks, heavy-duty trucks and nonroad diesel engines. Requires commission to phase in implementation of certain standards. Makes certain provisions operative January 1, 2019. Authorizes additional uses of moneys received by state pursuant to Volkswagen Environmental Mitigation Trust Agreement. Repeals state preemption of local regulation of idling by primary engines in commercial vehicles. Takes effect July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to engine emissions; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-19HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker.
2018-02-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules.
2018-02-14HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-09HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Health Care.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback