OR HB4001 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Environmental Quality Commission to adopt by rule program that places cap on greenhouse gas emissions and that provides market-based mechanism for covered entities to demonstrate compliance. Establishes program advisory committee. Declares legislative purposes of program and related investments of moneys received as proceeds under market-based compliance mechanism. Establishes certain statutory funds in State Treasury. Requires certain moneys received as proceeds under market-based compliance mechanism to be deposited in certain funds. Requires certain uses of moneys deposited in funds. Requires program advisory committee to submit biennial report to Governor and Legislative Assembly each even-numbered year. Requires Governor to consider investment and expenditures recommendations in biennial report during preparation of Governor's budget. Makes all provisions related to program adopted by commission and distribution of proceeds operative January 1, 2021. Authorizes commission and certain other agencies to adopt rules prior to operative date. Repeals greenhouse gas emissions goals and requires commission to adopt by rule statewide greenhouse gas emissions goal for 2025 and limits for years 2035 and 2050. Defines "greenhouse gas" for air pollution laws. Establishes Joint Legislative Committee on Climate. Modifies registration and greenhouse gas reporting requirements for certain persons. Makes provisions related to Joint Legislative Committee on Climate, greenhouse gas definition, emissions limits and registration and reporting operative January 1, 2019. Requires certain persons to pay annual program development fee to Department of Environmental Quality. Becomes operative July 1, 2019. Sunsets January 2, 2021. Provides for expedited review of Act by Supreme Court upon petition by adversely affected party. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to greenhouse gas emissions; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-03HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2018-02-22HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-20HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass, be referred to Rules, and then referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-14HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseInformational Meeting scheduled.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Energy and Environment with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback